THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:53:29 AM
James, Jacqueline Elizabeth
CPSO#:
58323
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite L5-026
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-8369
Fax: (416) 586-3194
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bridgepoint Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:03 Sep 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ELIZABETH JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1989 |