THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:04:29 AM
Weston, Bonnie Cynthia
CPSO#:
58303
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Eye Care Centre
1967 Riverside Dr.
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: (613)738-8400 Ext. 88537
Fax: (613) 738-8394
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking to access their medical record can contact: eyeDOCS 1285 Kilborn Ave Ottawa ON K1H 6K9 Tel: 613-733-8400.
Date Received: 15 Jan 2020
Instructions/Address:Paitents seeking to access their medical record can contact:
eyeDOCS
1285 Kilborn Ave
Ottawa ON K1H 6K(
Tel: 613-733-8400
Date Received: 21 Dec 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:28 Oct 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BONNIE CYNTHIA WESTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1988 |