THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:32:45 PM
Moran, Kevin Charles
CPSO#:
58290
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary Emergency
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 2B9
Phone: (416) 281-7270
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN CHARLES MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2020 |