THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:27:36 AM
Lee, Mark Ho
CPSO#:
58271
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
30 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
30-Jun-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mark Ho Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 12 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:07 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:05 Sep 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1988 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 30 Jun 2022 |