THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 11:59:56 AM
Kao, Shawn Shu-Kang
CPSO#:
58249
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON M9V 4C2
Phone: (416) 748-3939
Fax: (416) 748-7030
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:03 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAWN SHU-KANG KAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2023 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: December 16, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)