THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:06:03 AM
Macklin, Gloria Elizabeth
CPSO#:
58188
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Macklin Forse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 29 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:26 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 May 2023 |