THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:55:15 AM
McCauley, William Alan
CPSO#:
58170
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Nov 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76538
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:19 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALAN MCCAULEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCAULEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1989 |