THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:10:33 PM
Tucker, Nancy Audrey
CPSO#:
58157
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1 001
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6757
Fax: (416) 586-5915
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:16 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NANCY AUDREY TUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUCKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2006 |