THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:17:18 AM
Mai, Andrew David
CPSO#:
58151
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Vincent's Hospital
60 Cambridge St N
Ottawa ON K1R7A5
Phone: 613-562-6262
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mai Clark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Aug 1989 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID MAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2003 |