THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:46:50 PM
Silver, Eric Stuart
CPSO#:
58147
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416) 486-8788
Fax: (416) 486-4515
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Park Healthcare Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Aug 1989 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC STUART SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1988 |