THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:38:08 PM
Nowicki, Iwona Maria
CPSO#:
58123
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
231 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON N6J 2L3
Phone: (519) 963-0620
Fax: (519) 963-0621
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: I.M. Nowicki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IWONA MARIA NOWICKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWICKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1991 |