THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:50:12 PM
Simmons, William Wayne
CPSO#:
58109
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300 Plains Road East
Burlington ON L7T 2C6
Phone: (905) 639-6011
Fax: (905) 639-0516
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM WAYNE SIMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMONS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1988 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: March 29, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
William Simmons was charged with the following offences:
1. Impaired Operation of a Conveyance, on or about May 28, 2023, contrary to section 320.14(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Having over 80 mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a conveyance, contrary to section 320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: May 29, 2023
Place of Charge: St. Catharines, Ontario
Niagara Regional Police Service