THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:47:13 PM
Schreiber, Martin
CPSO#:
58106
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Health Centre
61 Queen Street East
9th Floor
Suite 133
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7454
Fax: (647) 351-1228
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:02 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN SCHREIBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHREIBER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Sep 1992
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1989 |