THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:20:36 AM
Schlosser, Robert Jonathan
CPSO#:
58098
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5-1600 Steeles Ave West
Thornhill ON L4K 4M2
Phone: (905) 763-8660
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:03 Sep 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JONATHAN SCHLOSSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHLOSSER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1988 |