THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:50:47 AM
Archie, Suzanne Marie
CPSO#:
58089
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Oct 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
East Region Mental Health Clinic
St. Joseph's Healthcare
2757 King St. East
Hamilton Ontario
Hamilton ON L8G 5E4
Phone: 905 573 4801
Fax: 905 573 4802
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARIE ARCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1988 |