THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:15:47 PM
Moussa, Madeleine
CPSO#:
58087
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36356
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Moussa Sadek-Botros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 27 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MADELEINE MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1991 |