THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:01:05 AM
Miller, Mark Lee
CPSO#:
58079
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 May 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2121 Main Street North
Jarvis Family Medical Centre
Jarvis ON N0A 1J0
Phone: 519-587-2268
Fax: (519) 587-5891
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Lee Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 29 2015
Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Lee Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK LEE MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 15 Oct 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2020 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Jun 2002
Summary:
On June 4, 2002, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Miller guilty of professional misconduct as defined under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93, in that he committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Committee therefore ordered and directed:
• the Registrar to suspend Dr. Miller’s certificate of registration for six (6) months and to suspend the effect of this part of the order in perpetuity if Dr. Miller successfully completes the College's record-keeping and communications courses at his own expense by February 15, 2003 and makes the costs payment set out below within 30 days of this date; otherwise, the Registrar is to impose the suspension on February 15, 2003
• Dr. Miller is to appear before the panel to be reprimanded
• Dr. Miller is to pay part of the College’s costs incurred in conducting the hearing, fixed in the amount of $500, payable within 30 days of the date of the order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 04, 2002
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: June 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As of April 3, 2018, Dr. Miller has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)