THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:56:12 AM
Nadolny, Laurie Jane
CPSO#:
58068
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Dec 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Liberman-Nadolny, Laurie Jane (used until: 22 Jun 1989 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact the Ratya Family Medical Centre at: 202-1637 Woodroffe Ave, Nepean, ON, K2G 1W2.
Date Received: 13 Mar 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Aug 1989 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jun 2023 |