THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:54:40 AM
Kreidstein, Michael Lloyd
CPSO#:
58036
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
300 York Mills Road
Toronto ON M2L 2Y5
Phone: (416) 391-4452
Fax: (416) 391-3031
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Anguilla
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:31 Aug 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LLOYD KREIDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREIDSTEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1988 |