THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:58:11 AM
Knapp, Charles David
CPSO#:
58011
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hungarian
Education: McMaster University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES DAVID KNAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNAPP is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1988 |