THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:53:15 AM
Granton, John Thomas
CPSO#:
58005
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
585 University Avenue
11 Munk 124
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4485
Fax: (416) 340-3359
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador
Nova Scotia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:16 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN THOMAS GRANTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1989 |