THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:53:43 AM
Stewart, Pamela Ann
CPSO#:
58003
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
1407 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M4T 1Y7
Phone: 416-922-3636
Fax: 416-922-3646
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAMELA ANN STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1988 |