THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:09:24 PM
Mukherjee, Ashok
CPSO#:
58002
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 May 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Sep 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON M1B 5N1
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: (416) 284-0141
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mukherjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:24 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHOK MUKHERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKHERJEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 May 1987 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 1988 |