THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:26:32 AM
Packer, Tamar
CPSO#:
57997
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Apr 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Apr 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
88 Maplewood Ave
hamilton Health Sciences
St. Peter's Hospital
CHief Family Medicine, Complex and
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAMAR PACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 01 Dec 1989
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2001 |