THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:53:28 PM
Lamont, Robert Neil
CPSO#:
57989
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7207
1800 - 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 372-3388
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brightshores Health System |
Owen Sound |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:11 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT NEIL LAMONT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMONT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1989 |