THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:10:51 PM
Clements, Karen Helen
CPSO#:
57985
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 May 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
490 York Rd
Building A, Suite 107
Guelph ON N1E 6V1
Phone: 5193623343
Fax: 5197669405
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Aug 1989 |
CFPC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN HELEN CLEMENTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENTS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Mar 1989 to 30 Apr 1989
EL - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Mar 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 1989 |