THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:53:28 AM
Vaezi, Aref
CPSO#:
57977
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Sep 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Persian
Education: McMaster University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bloor Dufferin Medical Centre
1011 Dufferin Street
Suite 204
Toronto ON M6H 4B5
Phone: (416) 531-3535
Fax: (416) 531-9962
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AREF VAEZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAEZI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 1988 |