THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:20:51 AM
Vincent, Mark David
CPSO#:
57969
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Dec 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Dec 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8600 Ext. 58640
Fax: (519) 685-8624
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:21 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:02 Sep 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID VINCENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINCENT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 1987 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Mar 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 1991 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1992 |