THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:53:40 PM
Blake, Peter Gerard
CPSO#:
57949
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8326
Fax: (519) 685-8470
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:07 Sep 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER GERARD BLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1992 |