THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:07:41 AM
Bertlik, Maria
CPSO#:
57945
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Dec 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English, Slovak
Education: University of Palacky, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Bertlik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:31 Morra Ave
Bolton, ON
L7E 4K5
Date Received: 01 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:08 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Aug 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 1994 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |