THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:21:56 AM
Wolfson, Nikolay Innovations
CPSO#:
57933
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2300 Sutter Street, Suite 207
San Francisco CA 94115
United States
Phone: (415) 221-4400
Fax: 415-798-2213
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - West Virginia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NIKOLAY INNOVATIONS WOLFSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1990 |