THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:06:06 PM
Panjwani, Dilip Dhanjibhai
CPSO#:
57902
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jan 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: University of Bombay, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Dilip D. Panjwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 4 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:01 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Feb 1987 to 16 Mar 1987
CF - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Mar 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 1994 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Nov 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2011 |