THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:54:16 PM
Allard, Johane Pierette
CPSO#:
57862
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jan 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
9N 973
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-5159
Fax: (416) 348-0065
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:28 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHANE PIERETTE ALLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLARD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1989 |