THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 5:39:48 AM
McGowan, Thomas Stanley
CPSO#:
57804
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Nov 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Nov 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-2200
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: T.S. McGowan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 31 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Trillium Health Partners, The Credit Valley Hospital, 2200 Eglinton Avenue West, Mississauga, ON, L5M 2N1
Date Received: 08 Aug 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Virgin Islands
USA - Georgia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:06 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THOMAS STANLEY MCGOWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGOWAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2018 |