THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:35:47 PM
Reddy, Eswaravaka Rajaram
CPSO#:
57759
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. E.R. Reddy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 1 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:10 Waters Edge Cir
St Catharines, Ontario
L2N 7S4
Date Received: 20 Apr 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 05 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 10 Apr 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 5, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As of April 10, 2019, Dr. Reddy has satisfied the Education, Supervision and Reassessment components of his Undertaking.
The following practice restriction(s) will remain in effect: Dr. Reddy must not engage in interpretation of computed tomography scans ("CTs"), mammography, nuclear medicine studies, or magnetic resonance imaging scans ('MRIs").
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eswaravaka Rajaram Reddy to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 5, 2017:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Reddy engaged in professional misconduct or was incompetent in his diagnostic radiology practice. As a result of the investigation:
• Dr. Reddy must not engage in interpretation of computed tomography scans (“CTs”), mammography, nuclear medicine studies, or magnetic resonance imaging scans (“MRIs”).
• Dr. Reddy will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
• Dr. Reddy will engage in professional education in chest, gastrointestinal, genitourinary, musculoskeletal and ultrasound imaging.
• Dr. Reddy’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within approximately three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
Download Full Document (PDF)