THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:03:16 AM
Soon-Shiong, Gregory
CPSO#:
57708
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Feb 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1V7
Phone: (905) 883-6614
Fax: (905) 883-6904
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:08 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY SOON-SHIONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOON-SHIONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1986 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2020 |