THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:22:47 PM
Hummel, David Brian
CPSO#:
57703
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Aug 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Aug 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
103E-4581 Highway 7 E
Unionville ON L3R 1M6
Phone: 905-479-9693
Fax: 905-415-1371
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:18 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology |
Effective:24 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID BRIAN HUMMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMMEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 1986 |