THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:05:28 AM
Sidhu, Gurpreet Singh
CPSO#:
57687
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Nov 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Nov 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Jammu University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
502 Oxford Street East
London ON N5Y 3H7
Phone: (519) 645-6000
Fax: (519) 433-5404
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1990 |