THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:19:24 PM
Burt, David William
CPSO#:
57673
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Apr 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: DBurt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Akausivik Inuit Family Health Team
24 Selkirk St
Vanier ON K1L 0A4
Date Received: 20 Jul 2021
Instructions/Address:Riverside Court Medical Clinic
3635 Rivergate Way, Ottawa, ON K1V 2A4
Phone: (613) 739-3700
Date Received: 31 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2021 |