THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:17:50 AM
Krajewski, Adam
CPSO#:
57651
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Toronto ON M3N 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21800
Fax: (416) 242-1058
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bridgepoint Hospital |
Toronto |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:28 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADAM KRAJEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAJEWSKI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1995 |