THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:42:00 AM
Pierro, Agostino
CPSO#:
57646
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Apr 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Rome, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of General &Thorac Surgery
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7340
Fax: (416) 813-7477
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:23 Apr 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 15 Dec 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Apr 2013 |
|
Active |