THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:14:49 PM
Morrow, Robert James
CPSO#:
57637
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: RJ Morrow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Docudavit Medical Solutions
Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 28 Mar 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:03 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jul 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2017 |