THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:56:11 PM
Walker, Cyril Robin
CPSO#:
57634
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 May 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
PO Box 5010, Stn B
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Mar 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CYRIL ROBIN WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2011 |