THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 19:03:53 PM
Kalisiak, Maria Teresa
CPSO#:
57628
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
05 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Maria Kalisiak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact Dr Bennett at the address above.
Dr Andrew Bennett
505 - 27 Roncesvalles Ave
Toronto, ON M6R 3B2
Date Received: 05 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2018 |