THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 4:00:22 AM
Lau, Robert
CPSO#:
57622
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Nov 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
27 & Finch Pediatrics
6620 Finch Ave West, Unit 6-7
Etobicoke ON M9V 5H7
Phone: 647 985 4236
Fax: 416 747 9441
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematology |
Effective:18 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Jul 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 1994 |