THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 3:14:49 AM
To, Toan Bao
CPSO#:
57605
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Nov 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: University of Saigon, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 623
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
Phone: (416) 743-3636
Fax: (416) 743-5961
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:27 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TOAN BAO TO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 1990 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 22 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 17 Aug 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2023 |