THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:52:06 AM
Prutis-Misterska, Krystyna Beata
CPSO#:
57594
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Sep 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Sep 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Polish, Russian
Education: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON M6H 3M1
Phone: (416) 652-6101
Fax: (416) 652-1994
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:31 Aug 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA BEATA PRUTIS-MISTERSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRUTIS-MISTERSKA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1993 |