THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:52:40 AM
Ginzburg, Brian Michael
CPSO#:
57536
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1NE-747
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6186
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:27 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN MICHAEL GINZBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINZBURG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1986 |