THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:49:23 AM
Liu, Suzy Sook Voon
CPSO#:
57526
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Suzy Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, [email protected], or 1 High Meadow Place Unit 13, Toronto, ON, M9L 0A3
Date Received: 05 Dec 2019
Instructions/Address:Patients and/or their representatives who are seeking copies of medical records may contact: Records Management Ltd. 1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13, Toronto, Ontario, M9L 0A3. Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: 647-933-2904
Date Received: 13 Nov 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |