THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:02:52 PM
Scott, Richard Tolchard
CPSO#:
57441
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Sep 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 4031 Station Main
Reach Niagara
St. Catharines ON L2R 7S3
Phone: 905-730-5647
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1986 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD TOLCHARD SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2020 |